Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL, GALLEYWOOD COMMON
Charity number: 1132183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David James Cattle | Chair | 02 October 2018 |
|
|||||
RICHARD JOSEPH JOHN HYLAND | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Travers Harpur | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Windus | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jaqueline Sigournay | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Adlington | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Tucker | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Broome | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janella Dawn Coates | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Troop | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Susan Janice Metcalfe | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wehren | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne Pepper | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Gillingham | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Dougan | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
BERYL ELIZABETH MOSS | Trustee | 04 August 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.