Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW, QUORN
Charity number: 1134810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Karen Anne Beecham | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||||
Charlotte Isabella Young | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Derek Charles Cooper | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Mary Treasure | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dawn Eleanor Daly | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Sandra Karen Marshall | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Jonathan Hugh Cox | Trustee | 16 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Leonard Alfred Mosley | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
JULIE CROYSDALE | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL TURLINGTON | Trustee | 22 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Turlington | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|||||||
MICHAEL GEOFFREY BIRD | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DIANE ELIZABETH BIRD | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DAVID FRANK BODICOAT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR TONY COATES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
HELEN DORISE AMANDA SHACKLOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr MARIANNE GILBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
KEITH FRANCIS CROYSDALE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.