Trustees ABINGDON BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1133953
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA SUSAN KING | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Rachel Anne Hughes | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hutt | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Rosalie Lorrison | Trustee | 04 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Pamela Maureen Pratt | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Christine Cairns | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Rodney Thomas Pollock | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Margaret Field | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev IAN LEONARD MILLGATE | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.