Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MERTON PRIORY
Charity number: 1134253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD MARK FRANKLIN EMINSON | Chair | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
DESMOND DAVIES | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Mary Warman | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anora Duncan | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Miller | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Delene Edwards | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Lilias Cherry | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Boris Yurkevich | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr KERRY AMANDA PORRITT | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Jin Ooi | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adewale Abiodun Erinle | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
THE REVD SIMON ANDREW ASQUITH | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EADES | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN BLADES | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
THE REVD ALISON GWENDOLYN JUDGE | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANN ELIZABETH ROBERTS | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE CLAIRE POWELL | Trustee | 06 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANN ELIZABETH NEWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EVA OSEIKUOR PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.