Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, SHADWELL
Charity number: 1134843
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Lang | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Joanna Golding | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
David Ricketts | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Charlene Chen | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Philippa Cook | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Nicola Taylor | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
David Watherston | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
David Cakebread | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Kristina Brooks | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Mark Bishop | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Kensah | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Timi Dorgu | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Samantha Thorn | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Philip Williams | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Richard Moules | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
KIRSTAN MCCONKEY | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|||||||
Dr PHILLIP RICE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.