Accounts and annual returns TRUST PROPERTY ADMINISTERED BY THE MERSEY SYNOD OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH
Charity number: 1132754
Charity reporting is up to date (119 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 February 2023 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 February 2023 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 135 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 03 September 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 03 September 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window