Trustees PLYMOUTH AND EXETER METHODIST DISTRICT
Charity number: 1134878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Daniel Richard Haylett | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev DEBORAH MARY KIRK | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev Loraine Nancy Mellor | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Sharon Ann Hurlow | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Marianne Patricia Barrett Rogers | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Simon Huw Leigh | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Ms Jane Allin | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Roy Gilbert Mitchell | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Jennifer Fogarty | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
Rev KEVIN PETER HOOKE | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
Rev ANDREW THOMAS VIDAMOUR | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
Mary Louise McNaughton | Trustee | 14 September 2013 |
|
|||||||
Miss Sue Bolt | Trustee | 13 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.