Governance GHANAIAN DOCTORS AND DENTISTS ASSOCIATION-UK CHARITY
Charity number: 1135453
Charity reporting is overdue by 168 days
Registration history:
- 12 April 2010: Standard registration
- 09 September 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 September 2012: Re-registered
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 31 January 2016: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- GDDA-UK CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.