Trustees ST PETERS CHURCH NEWTON SWANSEA P.C.C.
Charity number: 1135320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Canon Chris Darvill | Chair | 20 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Mathew James Joyce-Brown | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Karen Margaret Ann Lewis | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Gerald Partington | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Vanessa Morys Bassett | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Sian Littlemore | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Davies | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Jennifer Vaughton | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn Thomas Jones | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Angela Pattas | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Jan Osborne | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mike Abbett | Trustee | 06 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS LYNNE TURNER | Trustee | 05 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
TONY BATES | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|||||
MR PHILLIP ROGERS | Trustee | 26 April 2010 |
|
|||||
NICOLE ANNE TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN FRANCIS BATES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH POWELL BAHONSPACE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH CHIVERS VAUGHTON BM FRCS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.