Governing document AGE CONCERN YORK
Charity number: 500792
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MARCH 1971 AS AMENDED ON 17 JUNE 1993, 29 JUNE 1995, 26 SEPTEMBER 1996 AND 21 SEPTEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN YORK AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CITY OF YORK AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.