Trustees TEIGNMOUTH BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1135427
Charity reporting is overdue by 293 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Scott Bryan Marr | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
EMMA ROSS-MCNAIRN | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr CHAY BENJAMIN THOMAS | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
HUGH STANFORD RODWAY | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
REV KATHRYN LYNNE WILSON | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
REV GLENDA CHADWICK- DOWN | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev JAMES WILLIAM REDFERN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.