Trustees 1ST WOODCUTTS SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1135278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pete Wilkinson | Chair | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Lyndsey Booth | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin David Taylor | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Charles Reeks | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter George Goldstone | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Michael Peter Easton | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Beverley Ann Jesse | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Donna Rendell | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annette Michelle Toop | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Young | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abi Carlyle-Clarke | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Curtis | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.