Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. SAVIOUR, OXTON
Charity number: 1136160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Sandra Caulfield-Pleavin | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Sarah Rose Goulding | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denise Head | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy Smith | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Kewley | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Williams | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janine Unwin | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jon Richardson | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jen Biggs | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harold Keown | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Animesh Yunas | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Welding | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart White | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joseph Kennedy | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Chadwick | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mr Tony Parsons | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Amy Davies | Trustee | 25 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DENIS FRANCIS JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH MARGARET PARRY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.