Trustees AMERSHAM FREE CHURCH
Charity number: 1137287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV IAN GREEN | Chair | 04 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Underwood | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Heather McIntyre | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Munro ACMA | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Carolynn Elizabeth Croisdale-Appleby | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stanislaw Leslie Chrol-Frolowicz | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Ruby Richardson | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amela Nandanie Munro MBACP | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Deirdre Clark | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Anthony Wilkinson | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Leigh Waumsley BA | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ELDRIDGE | Trustee | 20 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Rev ERNA STEVENSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.