Trustees LIVERPOOL GUILD OF STUDENTS
Charity number: 1137398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vasiliki Samuels | Chair | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nikole Petratou-Wells | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rowan Bradbury | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gabriel Barbosa Pradal | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Omar Hussein | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Roy Whittle | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ali Mohamed Othman Ibrahim | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gabriella TAMAS | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Manley | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lina Dubbins | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Gnagniko | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.