Trustees REVELATION COMMUNITY
Charity number: 1138551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Benson | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Alice Bradberry | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alexander Sabin | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANTONIA ELIZABETH BRINDED | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Anne Stone | Trustee | 11 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Nicky McIntyre | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.