Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY HURDSFIELD
Charity number: 1140055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev James Campbell Ramsay Gibson | Chair | 19 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Eleanor Sarah Bird | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Heathcote | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Louise Vincent | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel India Riley | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Warham | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Ho | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Martin Heathcote | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Graham Rodwell | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Cottom | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ogbeialu Oluchi Nkochi-Nwankwo | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Geoffrey Burt | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELLEN MARY ELIZABETH WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.