Trustees HOME-START WORLDWIDE
Charity number: 1139678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Remenda Grech | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Reka Hegedus | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Craig Whelan | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Anthony Philip | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Cornelia de Bruijn | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthonius Gerardus Kragten | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Hickson | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yukie Yamada | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joan van Niekerk | Trustee | 30 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sheena Stewart | Trustee | 18 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.