Trustees THE NEWCASTLE AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 501464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA BOSSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Robert Lawton | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Dyer | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Birks | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Salmon | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Stone | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Birks | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Ann Thomas | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHELLEY BOSSON | Trustee | 30 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALISON RATCLIFFE | Trustee | 30 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS GILL JOHNSON | Trustee | 12 March 1990 |
|
|
||||
Larraine Hunter | Trustee | 01 March 1989 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.