Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BROWNHILLS WITH OGLEY HAY
Charity number: 1139697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Fiddler | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Green | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Pye | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Biggs | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gayle Greenway | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Stanley Cresswell | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Gillion | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Judith Wilkins | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joy Powell | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Powell | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Timmins | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROGER OWEN CORBETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENNIS POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH DIANE CORBETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.