Trustees BROCKWELL PARK COMMUNITY GREENHOUSES
Charity number: 1140590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Catherine Sara DAVID | Chair | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Oluwafunmilola Ajia | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Omar Salim Alghali | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Sebag | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Verena Kotonski | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Brotherston | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Russell | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Osei-Kwaku | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Worth | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.