Trustees BRITISH SOCIETY OF UROGYNAECOLOGY
Charity number: 1143157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashish Pradhan | Chair | 13 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ivilina Pandeva | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bhawana Purwar | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chendrimada Kaveriappa Madhu | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Alexander Iles | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ILIAS GIARENIS | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kapilmeet Kaur | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Lesley Guerrero | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Azar Khunda | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ganesh Thiagamoorthy | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.