Trustees THE MASTER AND FELLOWS OF DARWIN COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE
Charity number: 1141105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Michael Russell Wheldon Rands | Chair | 01 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Joshua Bickler | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pjotr Louis van der Jagt | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Niamh Hartley | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christine van Ruymbeke | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sara Theresa Baker | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ALAN FRANK BLACKWELL | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor James Benedict Rowe | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR Fiona Eve Karet | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Russell Paul Cowburn | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|||||
JOHN TANNATT DIX | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Duncan James Needham | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.