Trustees 3RD HANWORTH SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1142033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Gower | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Harding | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Bliss | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Westley | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Rehm | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Linda Amper-West | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER WESTLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS BRYENTON | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROGER HERBERT GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 14 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.