Governing document LIBANUS EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Charity number: 1147260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/01/1994 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/1998 AS AMENDED ON 01/10/2000 AS AMENDED ON 09/07/2003 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/2008 AS AMENDED ON 18/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.