Trustees UCLU
Charity number: 1142404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mx Mary McHarg | Chair | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grace Hu | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Serena Tedros | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mariya Kachwala | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aria Xingni Shi | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Isobelle Smith | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Shaban Chaudhary | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ahmad Ismail | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beth Beasant | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Petra Barran | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Margaret Bracey | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.