Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WILFRID, BOGNOR
Charity number: 1142723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joel John Mennie | Chair | 04 March 2020 |
|
|||||
John Bond | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Jim Barlett | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Tudor-Price | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Walden | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Hopkins | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Walden | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Hollingshead | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GLENDA RICHARDS | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE SMITH | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEITH RICHARDS | Trustee | 05 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.