Trustees EXETER SCRAPSTORE
Charity number: 1143182
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Claire Aroussi | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Kingdon | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Crewes | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CAIG | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|||||
NICOLA PITCHER | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.