Trustees BURTON JOYCE WITH BULCOTE AND STOKE BARDOLPH PCC
Charity number: 1144257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Foster | Chair | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Elizabeth Taylor | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Reeveley | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Reddington | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ROWE | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Alexander Leighton | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Winnett | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Brown | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Paul Baumohl | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Virginia Foster | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.