Trustees INSOLE COURT TRUST/YMDDIRIEDOLAETH CWRT INSOLE
Charity number: 1145649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Mitchell BA, PGCE | Chair | 17 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Neil Richardson | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Rohman | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Humphreys | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Monica Sophia Vasquez | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caryl Thomas | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Ellen Reid | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine O'Brien | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LEIGHTON PRIOR-MORRIS | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CLARKE | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Roblin | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Marilyn Davey | Trustee | 29 August 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.