Accounts and annual returns MARKAZI JAMIA MOSQUE RIZA & ISLAMIC CENTRE
Charity number: 1149039
Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 50 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 50 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 September 2023 | 413 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 September 2023 | 413 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 February 2022 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 16 February 2022 | 201 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 September 2020 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 September 2020 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window