Governing document SHREE GUJARATI HINDU SATSANG MANDAL,COVENTRY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/04/1973 AS AMENDED 24/11/1991, 17/4/1994, 10/8/2007 & 23/05/2010 & 05/07/12 as amended on 12 Jun 2016 as amended on 23 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE HINDU RELIGION, CULTURAL, CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND EDUCATIONAL ADVANCEMENT OF THE GUJARATI HINDU COMMUNITY IN COVENTRY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS. (B) TO MAINTAIN, ERECT, FOUND AND CARRY ON IN COVENTRY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS, PLACES OF WORSHIP FOR PERSONS OF THE HINDU RELIGION. (C) TO FOSTER AND ENCOURAGE THE RELIGIOUS AND CULTURAL AND INTELLECTUAL ADVANCEMENT OF PERSONS OF THE HINDU FAITH RESIDENT IN COVENTRY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS. (D) TO PROVIDE, ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN WEEKLY AND OTHER RELIGIOUS SERVICES, ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN HINDU RELIGIOUS CLASSES AND GUJARATI LANGUAGE CLASSES. (E) TO PROVIDE FOR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE HINDU RELIGION
Area of benefit
COVENTRY AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.