Trustees SHREE GUJARATI HINDU SATSANG MANDAL,COVENTRY
Charity number: 502515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAMAN BHIKHA CHAUHAN | Chair | 03 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dhirajlal Bhimji Ghedia | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohanlal Karasan Vegad | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alka Naren Gandhi | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ashok Kumar Savji Bhatti | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
HITESH MEHTA | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
INDRAVADAN NAGINDAS DAMANIA | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ramanbhai Lalbhai Mistry | Trustee | 19 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Amratlal Kunvarji Prajapati | Trustee | 19 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dinesh Amratilal Bhatti | Trustee | 19 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kantilal Patel | Trustee | 19 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dahyabhai Patel | Trustee | 19 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Arjunsinh Dahyabhai Kosambia | Trustee | 19 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Navnitlal Maganlal Patel | Trustee | 19 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
RANJUBEN POPAT | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
JASWANT LAL CHAUHAN | Trustee | 03 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
HARISH DHOKIA | Trustee | 03 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
VASANTIBEN GIRIRAJ CHAUHAN | Trustee | 10 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
SATYAVANBHAI KOTECHA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.