Governing document THE COLLEGE OF PODIATRY TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/12/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
4. OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY 4.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 4.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF DISEASES AND CONDITIONS OF THE FOOT AND ASSOCIATED STRUCTURES; 4.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF RESEARCH AND EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF PODIATRIC HEALTH RELATING IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PREVENTION AND THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES AND CONDITIONS OF THE FOOT AND ASSOCIATED STRUCTURES; 4.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND SCHOLARLY ACTIVITY FOR PODIATRISTS WITH A VIEW TO RAISING STANDARDS OF PODIATRY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; 4.1.4 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; AND 4.1.5 THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.