Accounts and annual returns ARTIST HUB
Charity number: 1149149
Charity reporting is overdue by 1693 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 232 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 232 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 597 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 597 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 962 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 962 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1327 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1327 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1693 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1693 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window