Trustees CHRISTCHURCH ILKLEY
Charity number: 1148214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Ribbands | Chair | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hugh Walker | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Shelia Carruthers | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Lacy | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Sayers | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Brunold | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Mannall | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN SCOTT | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Cook | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Duttine | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Christine Mary Knamiller | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Worrall | Trustee | 16 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Smith | Trustee | 16 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Evans | Trustee | 16 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lois Freeman | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Revd Dr Roberta Ruth Topham | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Iain Thake | Trustee | 09 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIET JANE AMOS | Trustee | 18 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID ROBERT GOULDESBROUGH | Trustee | 18 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET COOK | Trustee | 18 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.