Trustees HARTFORD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 502880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Jacob | Chair | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Sunners | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Humes | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Merson | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Fishburne | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Jennings | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Kelly | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wells | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leonie Giles | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Foster | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Lamb | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Grice | Trustee | 02 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.