Accounts and annual returns FAITH AND LIFE
Charity number: 1149974
Charity reporting is overdue by 293 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 293 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 293 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2023 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 13 April 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 13 April 2022 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 11 February 2022 | 438 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 13 April 2022 | 499 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 22 September 2021 | 662 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window