Trustees STOURPORT-ON-SEVERN WAR MEMORIAL PARK
Charity number: 503058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emese Burnip | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dale Morris | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Timothy Schmeising-Barnes | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Alan Sutton | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Ingrid Schmeising-Barnes | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Tim Berry | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Tim Berry | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Councillor John Thomas | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Williams | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Berenice Dawes | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Jackie Griffiths | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Brian Jones | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL FREEMAN | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|||||
ROBERT LLOYD | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER ROGERS | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|||||
NICKY MARTIN | Trustee | 06 March 2012 |
|
|||||
DAVID LITTLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
COUNCILLOR KEN HENDERSON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.