Accounts and annual returns THE JOSHUA DALE SKATE PARK FUND
Charity number: 1149537
Charity reporting is overdue by 77 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 77 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 77 days | |
Annual return | 01 July 2022 | 17 November 2023 | 200 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2021 | 09 November 2023 | 557 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2020 | 09 November 2023 | 922 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2019 | 09 November 2023 | 1287 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window