Governance 1ST BUXTON SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1152036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 15 May 2013: Standard registration
- 09 July 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 August 2015: Re-registered
- 09 July 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 February 2018: Re-registered
- 28 March 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 12 November 2018: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.