Trustees SHAKESPEARE LIVE
Charity number: 1155756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM FORESTER-PATON | Chair | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Marguerite Wilson | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Horrex | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neville Yates | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cork | Trustee | 07 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Kerensa McCondach | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Isabel Hume | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jude Bucklow | Trustee | 09 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Fowlds | Trustee | 09 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILL MORRELL | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN MORRELL | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PENNY CLEGG | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.