Trustees BROADGATE NATIONAL SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1149553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Jones | Chair | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Corrigan | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Jayne Hannigan | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MINISTER LYNETTE COULSTON | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNAH COX | Trustee | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Kincade | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
DENISE ANN McNULTY | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Scott Lornie | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PRENTICE | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
RITA BARBARA JONES | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA PRENTICE | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA TURNER | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.