Governing document TORFAEN MALE CHOIR (CÔR MEIBION TORFAEN)
Charity number: 503226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 5 MARCH 1974, AS AMENDED ON 19 JULY 2004 AND 4 OCTOBER 2009. AS AMENDED ON 20 JUL 2015 AS AMENDED ON 25 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 10 JUL 2017 as amended on 29 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE PRACTISE AND PERFORMANCE OF CHORAL WORK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED: IN PRACTICE CWMBRAN AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.