Accounts and annual returns SHEPPEY ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE
Charity number: 1151122
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 02 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 13 July 2020 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | 08 March 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window