Trustees THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR NANOMEDICINE
Charity number: 1151497
Charity reporting is up to date (40 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Robert Steven Conlan PhD, FSB | Chair | 09 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lewis Webb Francis | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr THOMAS OLIVER MCDONALD | Trustee | 19 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Thanou | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gavin Mark Roberts Jell | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr May Azzawi | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Christine Dufes | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christopher John Scott BSc, PhD | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR STEVEN PAUL RANNARD DPHIL FRSC | Trustee | 05 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ANDREW OWEN PhD | Trustee | 05 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.