Trustees FRIENDS OF THE EDWARD SAID NATIONAL CONSERVATORY OF MUSIC UK
Charity number: 1152645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN WILLIAM MACKAY HARTE | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Timothy Mattar | Trustee | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Countess of Sandwich Susan Caroline Montagu | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Usama Tuqan | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
WISSAM BOUSTANY | Trustee | 19 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
LENA SALEH | Trustee | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
LORD JOHN AMBROSE COPE OF BERKELEY | Trustee | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.