Trustees SMALL STEPS SFP
Charity number: 1150651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREA SAMUELSON | Chair | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Edwards | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Marillat | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nina Preston-Smith | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Christopher Richardson | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Lort-Philips | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Grace Chadd | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Challinor | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Sarson | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Kelly | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tim Theobalds | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|||||
JOANNA BROTHERSTONE | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.