Governing document PEMBURY U3A
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 NOV 2006 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUL 2008 AS AMENDED ON 03 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED ON 02 JUL 2013 AS AMENDED ON 05 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED ON 03 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 03 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 02 OCT 2018 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 07 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
PEMBURY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.