Trustees PEMBURY U3A
Charity number: 1153076
Charity reporting is up to date (69 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maggie Hall | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clair Dimitros | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Bridge | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Gardner | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Hougham | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annie Partridge | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Dyson | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Braam | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rick Lawrence | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Denman | Trustee | 04 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.